50
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Ray Shaw III (October 18, 1974)
|
45
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Gerald B. Goetemann (Retired)
(April 1, 1979)
|
43
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Truman A. Lipscomb (May 30, 1981)
- Deacon George Showalter (May 24, 1981)
|
42
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Bill Strange (May 15, 1982)
|
41
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Robert B. Lilly (Retired) (June 12,
1983)
- Deacon John F. Maher (June 12, 1983)
- Deacon Joseph J. Prentiss (June 12, 1983)
|
40
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Larry Hammel (May 19, 1984)
|
39
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon John J. Hanna (August 17, 1985)
- Deacon Albert L. Iafrate (Retired) (August 24, 1985)
|
37
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon John Divita (December 11, 1987)
|
36
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Russell J. Grant (November 5, 1988)
- Deacon David Wuletich (November 5, 1988)
- Deacon John Ziolkowski (November 5, 1988)
|
29
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Thom Trunzo (August 27, 1995)
|
23
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Doug Deem (October 10, 2001)
- Deacon Rod Fagert (October 10, 2001)
- Deacon Pierce Murphy (October 7,2001) Diocese of Boise
|
22
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Robert (Bob) Bittner (May 11, 2002)
|
20
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon Doug Breiding (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon Dave Galvin (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon Todd Garland (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon Raymond Godwin (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon Tony Maciorowski (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon Dennis Nesser (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon Steve Olenchock (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon Chuck Quigley (Retired) (October 2,
2004)
- Deacon John Sarraga (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon George Smoulder (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon Rue Thompson, Jr. (October 2, 2004)
- Deacon John Windett (October 2, 2004)
|
19
years of Ordination: |
- Deacon David Lester (October 9, 2005)
|
8
year of Ordination: |
- Deacon Brian Crim (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon Harry Evans (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon Robert Holliday (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon Peter Minogue (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon James Munuhe (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon Helgi Nelson (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon Vince Olenick (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon Luis Pagano (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon Marcus Pressl (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon Steve Wharton (May 7, 2016)
- Deacon John Yaquinta (May 7, 2016)
|